ID H0480 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding a biliteracy diploma for public school students who demonstrate proficiency in English and another language.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding a biliteracy diploma for public school students who demonstrate proficiency in English and another language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-24-2 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |