ID H0477 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

REAL ESTATE LICENSURE -- Amends existing law regarding oversight of real estate associates with respect to brokerage representation agreements and certain other documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law regarding oversight of real estate associates with respect to brokerage representation agreements and certain other documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2020-02-17SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-14Houseto Senate
2020-02-14HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-17-1
2020-02-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback