ID H0477 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to leases of state-owned recreational cottage site and homesite lands to remove an exception relating to specified law, to revise provisions relating to the rejection of bids and to provide that any unsuccessful bidder is entitled to a refund of their payment; and to repeal existing law relating to an exemption from specified conflict application and auction provisions for single family, recreational cottage sites and homesites and the auction of leases regarding certain state-owned land.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to leases of state-owned recreational cottage site and homesite lands to remove an exception relating to specified law, to revise provisions relating to the rejection of bids and to provide that any unsuccessful bidder is entitled to a refund of their payment; and to repeal existing law relating to an exemption from specified conflict application and auction provisions for single family, recreational cottage sites and homesites and the auction of leases regarding certain state-owned land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-29 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-29 | to Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-29 | Schaefer & Luker | |
2012-03-29 | 36-29-5 AYES -- Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Black, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Hagedorn, Hart, Harwood, Higgins, Killen, King, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Moyle, Nielsen, Palmer, Perry, Ringo, Schaefer, Shepherd, Simpson, Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson, Andrus, Batt, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hartgen, Henderson, Lacey, Lake, Marriott, Nesset, Nonini, Patrick, Pence, Raybould, Rusche, Shirley, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Wills, Wood(27) Absent and excused -- Jaquet, McGeachin, Roberts, Smith(24), Trail Floor Sponsors | |
2012-03-29 | PASSED | |
2012-03-29 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-29 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-27 | to engros | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-12 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-06 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-02-06 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-03 | to printing | |
2012-02-03 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-03 | House intro |