ID H0475 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR -- Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements regarding use of earned paid sick leave.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements regarding use of earned paid sick leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-03-13 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-28 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-25 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0475/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0475.pdf |