ID H0474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2018 Session Law Chapter 236 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2018 Session Law Chapter 236 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SESSION LAWS -- Repeals and adds to existing law to redesignate the code section regarding the publication of session laws.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to redesignate the code section regarding the publication of session laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2018 Session Law Chapter 236 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | to enrol |
2018-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-16 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2018-03-15 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2018-03-13 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-1 |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |