ID H0469 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to revise penalties for trafficking in heroin and to provide penalties for trafficking in fentanyl.
Title
Amends existing law to revise penalties for trafficking in heroin and to provide penalties for trafficking in fentanyl.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |