ID H0469 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/06/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/06/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise regulation and standards for certain buildings.
Title
Amends existing law to revise regulation and standards for certain buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 03/06/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/02 | |
2012-03-02 | To Governor | |
2012-03-01 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-28 | To enrol | |
2012-02-27 | to House | |
2012-02-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 28-5-1 | |
2012-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-14 | to Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 59-9-2 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Bus | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |