ID H0467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ARRESTS -- Amends existing law to remove a provision regarding when a peace officer may make an arrest.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a provision regarding when a peace officer may make an arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 47-12-11 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |