ID H0467 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to heating, ventilation and air conditioning contractors to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law relating to heating, ventilation and air conditioning contractors to revise a definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 49 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/07 | |
2012-03-07 | To Governor | |
2012-03-06 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-06 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-05 | To enrol | |
2012-03-02 | to House | |
2012-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-02-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-23 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-23 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-23 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-22 | to Senate | |
2012-02-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2012-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Bus | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |