ID H0464 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Motion to return to Health & Welfare Committee; return to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Motion to return to Health & Welfare Committee; return to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH CARE -- Adds to and amends existing law to authorize application for a certain waiver, to provide that the Board of Directors of the Idaho Individual High Risk Reinsurance Pool shall take certain action, to provide medical assistance eligibility for certain individuals and to provide that the Department of Health and Welfare will establish certain premiums and work requirements.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to authorize application for a certain waiver, to provide that the Board of Directors of the Idaho Individual High Risk Reinsurance Pool shall take certain action, to provide medical assistance eligibility for certain individuals and to provide that the Department of Health and Welfare will establish certain premiums and work requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Motion to return to Health & Welfare Committee; return to committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to return to Health & Welfare Committee; return to committee |
2018-02-27 | House | U.C. to return to Health & Welfare Committee; objection |
2018-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 19, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, February 15, 2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar until Tuesday, February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0464/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0464.pdf |