ID H0464 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to oil and gas to provide additional provisions relating to the public interest; to provide legislative intent to occupy the field of the regulation of oil and gas exploration and production, to provide an exception and to provide provisions limiting local restrictions relating to oil and gas; to revise provisions relating to the authority of the Oil and Gas Conservation Commission; to provide that certain uses of low temperature geothermal resources are not subject to the provisions of a certain Idaho Code chapter and to grant the director of the Department of Water Resources the authority to initiate a contested case upon certain conditions; to further define terms; and to provide that certain uses of ground water classified as a geothermal resource or material medium are not subject to the provisions of a certain Idaho Code chapter, and to grant the director of the Department of Water Resources the authority to initiate a contested case upon certain conditions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to oil and gas to provide additional provisions relating to the public interest; to provide legislative intent to occupy the field of the regulation of oil and gas exploration and production, to provide an exception and to provide provisions limiting local restrictions relating to oil and gas; to revise provisions relating to the authority of the Oil and Gas Conservation Commission; to provide that certain uses of low temperature geothermal resources are not subject to the provisions of a certain Idaho Code chapter and to grant the director of the Department of Water Resources the authority to initiate a contested case upon certain conditions; to further define terms; and to provide that certain uses of ground water classified as a geothermal resource or material medium are not subject to the provisions of a certain Idaho Code chapter, and to grant the director of the Department of Water Resources the authority to initiate a contested case upon certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/23/12 | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/20 | |
2012-03-20 | To Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-16 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-15 | To enrol | |
2012-03-14 | to House | |
2012-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 24-10-1 | |
2012-03-12 | Ret'd to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 3rd rdg -- to 14th Ord | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-20 | to Res/Env | |
2012-02-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-20 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-17 | to Senate | |
2012-02-17 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 54-13-3 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |