ID H0463 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TAXES -- Repeals, adds to and amends existing law to provide for applicability of the Internal Revenue Code to different tax years; to revise the calculation of a net operating loss; to revise the calculation of net taxable income for corporations; to reduce the individual and corporate income tax rate; and to provide for a child tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, adds to and amends existing law to provide for applicability of the Internal Revenue Code to different tax years; to revise the calculation of a net operating loss; to revise the calculation of net taxable income for corporations; to reduce the individual and corporate income tax rate; and to provide for a child tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 6, 2018
2018-03-06HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-02HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-02HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-01Senateto House
2018-03-01SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-01SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 26-9-0
2018-02-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-07Houseto Senate
2018-02-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-07HousePASSED 59-11-0
2018-02-07HouseMotion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed
2018-02-07HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders; objection
2018-02-07HouseRead Third Time in Full
2018-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback