ID H0462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 03/20/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 03/20/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to public utility regulation to revise the definition of "pipeline" and to define "gathering lines"; to provide that the term "public utility" shall cover cases relating to certain pipelines, to provide that such pipelines shall be subject to the safety supervision and regulation of the public utilities commission; and to provide that fees for pipeline corporations shall be calculated to recover the commission's time and expense devoted to the safety supervision and regulation of each pipeline corporation.
Title
Amends existing law relating to public utility regulation to revise the definition of "pipeline" and to define "gathering lines"; to provide that the term "public utility" shall cover cases relating to certain pipelines, to provide that such pipelines shall be subject to the safety supervision and regulation of the public utilities commission; and to provide that fees for pipeline corporations shall be calculated to recover the commission's time and expense devoted to the safety supervision and regulation of each pipeline corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 72 Effective: 03/20/12 | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/14 | |
2012-03-14 | To Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-12 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-09 | To enrol | |
2012-03-08 | to House | |
2012-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-16 | to Res/Env | |
2012-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-16 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-15 | to Senate | |
2012-02-15 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |