ID H0461 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE SOVEREIGNTY -- Adds to existing law to provide a procedure for invalidating certain public laws, regulations or cases, to provide prohibition on enforcement, to provide penalties and to provide for a civil action.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide a procedure for invalidating certain public laws, regulations or cases, to provide prohibition on enforcement, to provide penalties and to provide for a civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-02-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 29-40-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 19, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |