ID H0459 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide for nonresident hunting with three day fishing licenses; and to provide a fee for such license.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for nonresident hunting with three day fishing licenses; and to provide a fee for such license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/16 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to House | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-27 | to Res/Env | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-24 | to Senate | |
2012-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2012-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |