ID H0458 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ARCHITECTS -- Repeals existing law and enacts the Idaho Architecture Practice Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law and enacts the Idaho Architecture Practice Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on March 13, 2018
2018-03-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-19Houseto Senate
2018-02-19HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-2
2018-02-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 19, 2018
2018-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback