ID H0457 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES - Amends existing law to revise conditions under which special license plate programs shall be discontinued.
Title
Amends existing law to revise conditions under which special license plate programs shall be discontinued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2016-02-22 | House | FAILED -- 25-43-2 |
2016-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 22, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |