ID H0455 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD PROTECTION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reporting of child abuse, abandonment, or neglect.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reporting of child abuse, abandonment, or neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-02-28 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-21 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |