ID H0452 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RIGHT TO REPAIR -- Adds to exisiting law to establish the Right to Repair Act.
Title
Adds to exisiting law to establish the Right to Repair Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-03-13 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-28 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-25 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0452/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0452.pdf |