ID H0451 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INCOME TAXATION -- Amends existing law to provide an income tax credit for charitable contributions made to medical residency placement organizations accredited by the Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education or the American Osteopathic Association or their designated nonprofit support organizations based in Idaho and devoted to training residents in Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide an income tax credit for charitable contributions made to medical residency placement organizations accredited by the Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education or the American Osteopathic Association or their designated nonprofit support organizations based in Idaho and devoted to training residents in Idaho.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on February 28, 2018
2018-02-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-02-27SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-02-23HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-22Senateto House
2018-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1
2018-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-02-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-07Houseto Senate
2018-02-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-19-0
2018-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback