ID H0451 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXATION -- Amends existing law to provide an income tax credit for charitable contributions made to medical residency placement organizations accredited by the Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education or the American Osteopathic Association or their designated nonprofit support organizations based in Idaho and devoted to training residents in Idaho.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an income tax credit for charitable contributions made to medical residency placement organizations accredited by the Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education or the American Osteopathic Association or their designated nonprofit support organizations based in Idaho and devoted to training residents in Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2 |
2018-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-19-0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |