ID H0448 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 181 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BREASTFEEDING -- Amends existing law to provide exemptions from indecent exposure and obscenity for breastfeeding mothers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide exemptions from indecent exposure and obscenity for breastfeeding mothers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 181 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2018
2018-03-16HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-12Senateto House
2018-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-22Houseto Senate
2018-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-3
2018-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback