ID H0436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2022 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2022 SECTION 1 -3; 02/04/2022 SECTION 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2022 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2022 SECTION 1 -3; 02/04/2022 SECTION 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to revise the individual and corporate income tax rate and to provide for an income tax rebate.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the individual and corporate income tax rate and to provide for an income tax rebate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2022 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2022 SECTION 1 -3; 02/04/2022 SECTION 4 |
2022-02-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on February 2, 2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-02-01 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-01-20 | House | to Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Title apvd |
2022-01-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-13-0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |