ID H0436 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO DAY - Amends existing law to revise the day of celebration for Idaho Day when March 4 falls on a Saturday or Sunday.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the day of celebration for Idaho Day when March 4 falls on a Saturday or Sunday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-14 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-08 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-08 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2016-02-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-05 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of House bills of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |