ID H0432 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: 03/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: 03/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT COUNCIL -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the makeup, composition and duties of the Workforce Development Council in the Department of Labor.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the makeup, composition and duties of the Workforce Development Council in the Department of Labor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 47 Effective: 03/12/2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on March 8, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-14 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-13-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |