ID H0431 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION - Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain property exempt from taxation.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding certain property exempt from taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-08 | Senate | PASSED -- 23-11-1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-09 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-09 | House | PASSED -- 55-15-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |