ID H0429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIME VICTIMS COMPENSATION -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding payment for the costs of forensic and medical examinations of alleged victims of sexual assault.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding payment for the costs of forensic and medical examinations of alleged victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | to enrol |
2018-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2018-03-16 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2018-03-14 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration for concurrence recommendation |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-1-1 |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |