ID H0420 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide for an income tax deduction of military retirement benefits regardless of age.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for an income tax deduction of military retirement benefits regardless of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2014-02-24 | House | FAILED -- 31-35-4 |
2014-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |