ID H0416 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE HISTORICAL SOCIETY -- Amends existing law to provide that certain artifacts, materials and buildings are held in trust for the people of the state of Idaho; to provide for the treatment of such collections; and to provide that such collections shall not be capitalized, defined as financial assets or sold to finance debt or infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that certain artifacts, materials and buildings are held in trust for the people of the state of Idaho; to provide for the treatment of such collections; and to provide that such collections shall not be capitalized, defined as financial assets or sold to finance debt or infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-12SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-09Houseto Senate
2018-02-09HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-09HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2
2018-02-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, February 9, 2018
2018-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-29HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-01-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback