ID H0415 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EXCUSED ABSENCE FROM SCHOOL -- Adds to existing law to provide that a student sounding taps at a military honors funeral held in this state for a deceased veteran shall be allowed an excused absence, to provide for notice, to provide for the effect on the calculation of daily attendance and compulsory attendance and to provide for the completion of school work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that a student sounding taps at a military honors funeral held in this state for a deceased veteran shall be allowed an excused absence, to provide for notice, to provide for the effect on the calculation of daily attendance and compulsory attendance and to provide for the completion of school work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2018-02-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-14Houseto Senate
2018-02-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-02-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, February 14, 2018
2018-02-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback