ID H0403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law to provide for Idaho 4-H License Plates.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to provide for Idaho 4-H License Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 82 Effective: 01/01/2015 |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 11, 2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-06 | Senate | PASSED -- 29-6-0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-17 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2014-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 17, 2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |