ID H0402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD PROTECTION -- Amends existing law to require training on the constitional rights of persons involved in child protection investigations.
Title
Amends existing law to require training on the constitional rights of persons involved in child protection investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-24 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-15-1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |