ID H0400 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 05/10/2021 SECTION 1 & 2; 07/01/2021 SECTION 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 05/10/2021 SECTION 1 & 2; 07/01/2021 SECTION 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- WELFARE DIVISION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2021.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 05/10/2021 SECTION 1 & 2; 07/01/2021 SECTION 3 |
2021-05-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-05-05 | Senate | to House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-2-0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-05-04 | House | to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Title apvd |
2021-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |