ID H0399 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to remove a prohibition relating to the hunting of big game by persons with a junior hunting license who are ten or eleven years of age and are accompanied in the field by an adult licensed to hunt in Idaho; to provide that a license may be issued to certain qualified persons who are nine years of age to allow the application for a controlled hunt big game tag; and to provide that persons with certain licenses shall be entitled to fish in the waters of the state for a period of three consecutive days in each license year.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a prohibition relating to the hunting of big game by persons with a junior hunting license who are ten or eleven years of age and are accompanied in the field by an adult licensed to hunt in Idaho; to provide that a license may be issued to certain qualified persons who are nine years of age to allow the application for a controlled hunt big game tag; and to provide that persons with certain licenses shall be entitled to fish in the waters of the state for a period of three consecutive days in each license year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 11, 2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-06 | Senate | PASSED -- 24-11-0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-19 | House | PASSED -- 51-16-3 |
2014-02-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |