ID H0396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SHOOTING RANGES -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to provide additional powers and duties of the Fish and Game Commission, to provide that the director of the Department of Fish and Game shall consult with other agencies to identify suitable land for shooting ranges, and to provide for the Public Shooting Range Fund.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to provide additional powers and duties of the Fish and Game Commission, to provide that the director of the Department of Fish and Game shall consult with other agencies to identify suitable land for shooting ranges, and to provide for the Public Shooting Range Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-2-0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-14-2 |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |