ID H0393 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to rural health care access and physician incentive to provide for the Physician Incentive Fund to be administered by the Department of Health and Welfare; to provide for the Joint Health Care Access and Physician Incentive Grant Review Board; to provide for the scope of rural health care access and physician incentive grant support; to provide for grants to physicians for qualified medical education debt repayments; to provide for rural health care access grant awards and to provide for physician incentive grant awards; to provide for categories of grants; to provide requirements and criteria for grant awards; to provide for applications; to provide a schedule for awards, to provide for the disbursal of approved rural health care access grants and rural physician incentive grants.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to rural health care access and physician incentive to provide for the Physician Incentive Fund to be administered by the Department of Health and Welfare; to provide for the Joint Health Care Access and Physician Incentive Grant Review Board; to provide for the scope of rural health care access and physician incentive grant support; to provide for grants to physicians for qualified medical education debt repayments; to provide for rural health care access grant awards and to provide for physician incentive grant awards; to provide for categories of grants; to provide requirements and criteria for grant awards; to provide for applications; to provide a schedule for awards, to provide for the disbursal of approved rural health care access grants and rural physician incentive grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/05 | |
2012-03-05 | To Governor | |
2012-03-02 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-01 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-29 | To enrol | |
2012-02-28 | to House | |
2012-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-1 | |
2012-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Educ | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-14 | to Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 66-2-2 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-09 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-08 | to engros | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-07 | To Gen Ord | |
2012-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-23 | to Educ | |
2012-01-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-20 | to printing | |
2012-01-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-20 | House intro |