ID H0385 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2020 Session Law Chapter 116 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2020 Session Law Chapter 116 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NURSES -- Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding certified medication assistants and to provide for a registry of such professionals.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding certified medication assistants and to provide for a registry of such professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2020 Session Law Chapter 116 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2020-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |