ID H0384 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Returned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO WRONGFUL CONVICTION ACT -- Adds to existing law to provide for a claim of compensation for a person who is wrongfully convicted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for a claim of compensation for a person who is wrongfully convicted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2020
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020
2020-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-18Houseto enrol
2020-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-18HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-18HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-18HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2020-03-18HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2020-03-18HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2020-03-18Senateto House
2020-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-18SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-0-3
2020-03-17SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2020-03-16SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-16SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-16SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-03-16SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-03-16SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-09SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2020-02-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-19Houseto Senate
2020-02-19HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2020-02-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-17HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback