ID H0383 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CIGARETTE AND TOBACCO TAXES -- Amends existing law to provide for collection and enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for collection and enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 7, 2018
2018-03-07HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-06SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-06SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-05Houseto enrol
2018-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-05HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 5, 2018
2018-02-28HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-27HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-02-26HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-02-26HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Revenue & Taxation for concurrence recommendation
2018-02-23HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-02-22Senateto House
2018-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-22SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-15SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-13SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-02-13SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-02-13SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-02SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-01-30SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-29Houseto Senate
2018-01-29HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-29HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-01-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-24HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback