ID H0383 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CIGARETTE AND TOBACCO TAXES -- Amends existing law to provide for collection and enforcement.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for collection and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | to enrol |
2018-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2018-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 5, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2018-02-26 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Revenue & Taxation for concurrence recommendation |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-01-29 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |