ID H0382 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Read second time; filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WATER -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the Bear River water rights adjudication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the Bear River water rights adjudication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2020-02-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-10Houseto Senate
2020-02-10HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-10HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2020-02-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback