ID H0378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATURE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding how vacancies are filled.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding how vacancies are filled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2020-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 28-42-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |