ID H0378 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SECRETARY OF STATE -- Amends existing law to update the duties of the Secretary of State.
Title
Amends existing law to update the duties of the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 07/01/2017 |
2018-02-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:05 a.m. on February 6, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-01-31 | Senate | to House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-01-23 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2018-01-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |