ID H0374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- FAMILY AND COMMUNITY SERVICES -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on May 4, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-05-03 | Senate | to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-21 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-21 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |