ID H0370 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BARBERS - Amends existing law to provide additional requirements regarding certain schools and colleges.
Title
Amends existing law to provide additional requirements regarding certain schools and colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | U.C. to be returned to Business Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/H0370.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/H0370.pdf |