ID H0368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide that no person shall serve in the Legislature while holding other elective office.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that no person shall serve in the Legislature while holding other elective office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2014-01-31 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0368.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0368.pdf |