ID H0367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide circumstances when the Idaho National Guard and the Idaho Military Division shall be deemed to be a state law enforcement agency.
Title
Amends existing law to provide circumstances when the Idaho National Guard and the Idaho Military Division shall be deemed to be a state law enforcement agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0367.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0367.pdf |