ID H0366 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: Thirty (30) days following the issuance of a decision upholding a restriction or ban on abortion of a preborn child with a heartbeat by any US appellete court.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: Thirty (30) days following the issuance of a decision upholding a restriction or ban on abortion of a preborn child with a heartbeat by any US appellete court.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FETAL HEARTBEAT PREBORN CHILD PROTECTION ACT -- Adds to existing law to prohibit an abortion following detection of a fetal heartbeat.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit an abortion following detection of a fetal heartbeat.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: Thirty (30) days following the issuance of a decision upholding a restriction or ban on abortion of a preborn child with a heartbeat by any US appellete court. |
2021-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:05 a.m. on April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-04-21 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-7-3 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-16 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-16 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 53-16-1 |
2021-04-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |