ID H0361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2016 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2016 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX - AIRCRAFT - Amends existing law to remove a sunset clause.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a sunset clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2016 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 02/19/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on February 15, 2016 |
2016-02-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-02-09 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-09 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-1-0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-01 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-01 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2016-02-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 1, 2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |