ID H0360 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ASSAULT AND BATTERY -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding counseling, to provide that the supreme court shall establish a certain rule and to provide that a person guilty of attempted strangulation shall undergo a certain evaluation, counseling and other treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding counseling, to provide that the supreme court shall establish a certain rule and to provide that a person guilty of attempted strangulation shall undergo a certain evaluation, counseling and other treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-01-30SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-29Houseto Senate
2018-01-29HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-29HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-01-26HouseMotion to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 29, 2018; motion passed
2018-01-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 29, 2018; objection
2018-01-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback